There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Border and Homeland Security Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for enhanced border security, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/25/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
07/21/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/11/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/11/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/02/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/25/2014Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/25/2014Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/25/2014Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/25/2014Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/25/2014Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security06/25/2014 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security07/11/2014 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies07/11/2014 Referred to
House Judiciary06/25/2014 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security07/21/2014 Referred to
House Natural Resources06/25/2014 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation07/02/2014 Referred to
House Agriculture06/25/2014 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4962.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4962. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/25/2014)

National Border and Homeland Security Act - Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to give state criminal alien assistance program (SCAAP) funding priority to: (1) northern or southern border states, or (2) state political subdivisions having one of the four largest populations of unlawfully present aliens for the preceding fiscal year.

Amends the Illegal Immigration Reform and Immigrant Responsibility Act of 1996 to direct the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) (Secretary) to complete the required 700 mile southwest border fencing and priority-area fencing by December 31, 2015.

Amends the Secure Fence Act of 2006 to direct the Secretary, in consultation with state and local officials along the U.S.-Mexico border, to achieve operational control over U.S. international land and maritime borders by December 31, 2015.

Directs the Secretary to:

  • increase the number of full-time, active-duty Border Patrol agents through FY2018;
  • increase the number of U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) officers at U.S. ports of entry through FY2018; and
  • establish within 18 months the biometric entry and exit data system required by the Intelligence Reform and Terrorism Prevention Act of 2004.

Prohibits the Secretary of the Interior and the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA) from impeding border security-related activities by the Secretary on U.S. public lands.

Amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to direct the Domestic Nuclear Detection Office (of DHS), in protecting the United States from a nuclear, fissile material, or radiological attack, to consider potential smuggling routes in land border areas between ports of entry, railcars entering the United States from Canada or Mexico, and private aircraft or small vessels.

Directs the Secretary to procure within one year the number of next generation portable radiation detectors (PRDs) and radioactive isotope identification devices (RIIDs) required by the Border Patrol along the southern and northern U.S. borders.

Directs the Secretary to develop within one year, and implement within two years of development, a strategic plan to detect and interdict biological and chemical weapons entering the United States.