Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/05/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/08/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/08/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/25/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/25/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/25/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 02/25/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/25/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 02/25/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 02/25/2013
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/25/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/25/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/25/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/25/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/25/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/25/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 02/25/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/25/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 02/25/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 02/25/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 03/15/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 03/15/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/15/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/24/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 04/24/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/24/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 05/09/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/09/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/09/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/09/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/22/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/09/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/09/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/09/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/09/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/22/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/12/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/07/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/06/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 02/11/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 03/25/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/03/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/07/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/07/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/09/2014
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 05/01/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/01/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/01/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 05/01/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/01/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/01/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/07/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/07/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 05/07/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/07/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/15/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/19/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/19/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/19/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/31/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/31/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/31/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/31/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/31/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/31/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/31/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/31/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 07/31/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/31/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/31/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 07/31/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/31/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/31/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 07/31/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/31/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 07/31/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/31/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/09/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 09/09/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 09/09/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/09/2014