There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Stop Corporate Expatriation and Invest in America's Infrastructure Act of 2014

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to modify the rules relating to inverted corporations and to transfer the resulting revenues to the Highway Trust Fund.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/26/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
06/26/2014Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2014Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (61)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 06/26/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/26/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 06/26/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 06/26/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/09/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/09/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/09/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/09/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/09/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/09/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/09/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/09/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/09/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/09/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/15/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 07/15/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/31/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/08/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/08/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 09/08/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 09/11/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/17/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means06/26/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4985. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/26/2014)

Stop Corporate Expatriation and Invest in America's Infrastructure Act of 2014 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to revise rules for the taxation of inverted corporations (i.e., U.S. corporations that acquire foreign companies to reincorporate in a foreign jurisdiction with income tax rates lower than the United States) to provide that a foreign corporation that acquires the properties of a U.S. corporation or partnership after May 8, 2014, shall be treated as an inverted corporation and thus subject to U.S. taxation if, after such acquisition: (1) it holds more than 50% of the stock of the new entity (expanded affiliated group), or (2) the management or control of the new entity occurs primarily within the United States and the new entity has significant domestic business activities.

Authorizes additional appropriations to the Highway Account and Mass Transit Account in the Highway Trust Fund.