There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Streamlined and Improved Methods at Polling Locations and Early (SIMPLE) Voting Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Help America Vote Act of 2002 to promote early voting in elections for Federal office and to prevent unreasonable waiting times for voters at polling places used in such elections, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/03/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
01/03/2013Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (69)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/06/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 02/06/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/06/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/06/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 02/06/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/06/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/06/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/06/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/06/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/06/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/06/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/06/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 02/06/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 02/06/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/06/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 02/06/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/06/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 02/06/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 02/06/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/06/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/06/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/06/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/06/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/06/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 02/06/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/06/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 02/06/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/06/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 02/06/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/06/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 02/06/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 02/06/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 02/06/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 02/06/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 02/06/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/06/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 02/06/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 02/06/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/06/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/14/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/14/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/14/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/14/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/28/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 02/28/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/28/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/09/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 04/09/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 06/03/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/25/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 11/18/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/20/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/03/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/08/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration01/03/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.50.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.50. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2013)

Streamlined and Improved Methods at Polling Locations and Early (SIMPLE) Voting Act of 2013 - Amends the Help America Vote Act of 2002 (HAVA) to require each state to allow individuals to vote in a federal election on each day during the 15-day period ending on the second day immediately preceding the election date in the same manner as voting is allowed on election day.

Requires a state to ensure that each polling place that allows early voting in a federal election is located within reasonable walking distance of a stop on a public transportation route.

Requires the Election Assistance Commission to issue standards for the administration of early voting in a federal election.

Requires each state to provide a sufficient number of voting systems, poll workers, and other election resources (including physical resources) at a polling place used in a federal election to ensure: (1) a fair and equitable waiting time for all voters in the state, and (2) that no individual will be required to wait longer than one hour to cast a ballot at the polling place.

Requires each state to develop, and implement to the greatest extent practicable, a contingency plan under which it shall provide any polling place on a federal election day whose waiting times exceed one hour with additional poll workers, machines, ballots, and other equipment and supplies, including a polling place at which individuals may cast ballots before the election date.

Requires the Commission to report to Congress biennially on the impact of this Act's early voting and waiting time provisions on the administration of elections for federal office.

Prescribes requirements for the counting of provisional ballots that will be treated as votes.

Allows civil money penalties, intervention by aggrieved parties, and private actions to address HAVA violations by a state or jurisdiction.