Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/06/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/06/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/06/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/06/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/06/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/06/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/06/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/06/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/06/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/06/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/06/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/06/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 02/06/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/06/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/06/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 02/06/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/06/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/06/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 02/06/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/06/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/06/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/06/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/06/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/06/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/06/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/06/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 02/06/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/06/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 02/06/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/06/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/06/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/06/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/06/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/06/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 02/06/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/06/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/06/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/06/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 02/06/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/14/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/14/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/14/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/14/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/28/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 02/28/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/28/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/09/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 04/09/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/03/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/25/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/18/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/20/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/03/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/08/2014