Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/13/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/13/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/04/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/06/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/12/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/15/2013