There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

May 31, 1918 Act Repeal Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

May 31, 1918 Act Repeal Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

May 31, 1918 Act Repeal Act

Short Titles as Introduced

May 31, 1918 Act Repeal Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

May 31, 1918 Act Repeal Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To repeal the Act of May 31, 1918, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/18/2014Became Public Law No: 113-262. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2014Signed by President.
12/17/2014Presented to President.
12/15/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6840)
12/02/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 418 - 0 (Roll no. 535).(text: CR 12/1/2014 H8186)
12/01/2014Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-631.
07/09/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
12/18/2014Became Public Law No: 113-262. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2014Signed by President.
12/17/2014HousePresented to President.
12/16/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/15/2014SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6840)
12/03/2014SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
12/02/2014-1:34pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/02/2014-1:34pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 418 - 0 (Roll no. 535). (text: CR 12/1/2014 H8186)
12/02/2014-1:25pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8238-8239)
12/01/2014-4:37pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/01/2014-4:32pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5050.
12/01/2014-4:32pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8186)
12/01/2014-4:32pmHouseMr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/01/2014HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 471.
12/01/2014HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-631.
09/18/2014HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
09/18/2014HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/18/2014HouseSubcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
07/29/2014HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian and Alaska Native Affairs
07/15/2014HouseReferred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/09/2014HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
07/09/2014HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/23/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources07/09/2014 Referred to
09/18/2014 Markup by
12/01/2014 Reported by H. Rept. 113-631
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian and Alaska Native Affairs07/15/2014 Referred to
07/29/2014 Hearings by
09/18/2014 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.5050. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-262 (12/18/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

May 31, 1918 Act Repeal Act - Repeals the 1918 Act (authorizing the establishment of a town site on the Fort Hall Indian Reservation in Idaho).

Grants the Shoshone-Bannock Tribes of the Fort Hall Reservation the exclusive right of first refusal to purchase at fair market value any land offered for sale within the Fort Hall Townsite.

Requires the United States to hold in trust for the benefit of the Tribes or a member of the Tribes, as applicable, any land owned or acquired by the Tribes or a member of the Tribes within the Fort Hall Townsite before, on, or after this Act's enactment.