Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/28/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/12/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/20/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/20/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/20/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/20/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/20/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/09/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/09/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/18/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/09/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 05/09/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/09/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/20/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/20/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/20/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 06/20/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/20/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 07/11/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/24/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/24/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/11/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/11/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/12/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/24/2014