Refine your search

8 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
07/25/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-134.
07/25/2014 Signed by President.
07/15/2014 Presented to President.
07/09/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4355-4364; text as passed Senate: CR S4355-4356)
04/10/2014 Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Landrieu without amendment. With written report No. 113-148.
05/06/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 2 (Roll no. 131).(text: CR H2411)
04/09/2013 Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-27.
02/05/2013 Introduced in House