Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/05/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 02/05/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/27/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/21/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/16/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/16/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/23/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 04/23/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/24/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/24/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 04/25/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/06/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/06/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/08/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 05/13/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/16/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 05/21/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/23/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 05/23/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 05/23/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 05/23/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/23/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/23/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/23/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 06/03/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/04/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/04/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/06/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/06/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/06/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 06/11/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/11/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/11/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 06/12/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/14/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/25/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/25/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/26/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/27/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/27/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/27/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/11/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 07/16/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/17/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/17/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/17/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 07/17/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/19/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/23/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/24/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/26/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 08/01/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 08/01/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 08/02/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 08/02/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 09/09/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/04/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 01/03/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 01/31/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 02/03/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/06/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/25/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/03/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 04/08/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 04/10/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/28/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/06/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/06/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 05/06/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/22/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/28/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 09/09/2014