There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the Law School Clinic Certification Program of the United States Patent and Trademark Office, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/16/2014Became Public Law No: 113-227. (TXT | PDF)
12/16/2014Signed by President.
12/09/2014Presented to President.
12/04/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/04/2014Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6354)
09/15/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 327 - 22 (Roll no. 497).(text: CR H7482)
09/15/2014Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-588.
07/15/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
12/16/2014Became Public Law No: 113-227. (TXT | PDF)
12/16/2014Signed by President.
12/09/2014HousePresented to President.
12/08/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/04/2014SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/04/2014SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6354)
09/16/2014SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
09/15/2014-6:58pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 327 - 22 (Roll no. 497). (text: CR H7482)
09/15/2014-6:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/15/2014-6:30pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7485-7486)
09/15/2014-5:09pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/15/2014-5:01pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5108.
09/15/2014-5:01pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7481-7483)
09/15/2014-5:01pmHouseMr. Chabot moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/15/2014HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 435.
09/15/2014HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-588.
09/10/2014HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/10/2014HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/09/2014HouseSubcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet Discharged.
07/16/2014HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/15/2014HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
07/15/2014HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/15/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/15/2014 Referred to
09/10/2014 Markup by
09/15/2014 Reported by H. Rept. 113-588
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet07/16/2014 Referred to
09/09/2014 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary09/16/2014 Referred to
12/04/2014 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.5108.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.5108. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-227 (12/16/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on September 15, 2014. The summary of the House passed version is repeated here.)

Establishes the Law School Clinic Certification Program of the United States Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO) to allow students enrolled in a participating law school's clinic to practice patent and trademark law before the USPTO on a pro-bono basis for clients that qualify for assistance from the law school's clinic.

Requires the USPTO Director to establish regulations and procedures for application to and participation in such program. Makes all law schools accredited by the American Bar Association eligible to participate in the program after being examined for acceptance using identical criteria.

Provides for the program to be in effect for the 10-year period after enactment of this Act.

Requires the Director, within two years after enactment of this Act, to report to Congress regarding the work done through the program and the number of participating law schools and students.