Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/21/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/09/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/05/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/19/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/11/2013