There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Asylum Reform and Border Protection Act of 2014

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • National Security and Federal Lands Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To modify the treatment of unaccompanied alien children who are in Federal custody by reason of their immigration status, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/17/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
09/02/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/18/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/18/2014Provisions of H.R. 2398, as introduced, were included in Sec. 16 of H.R. 5137, as introduced. See also H.R. 2398 under Legislation Referred.
07/18/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/17/2014Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/17/2014Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/17/2014Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/17/2014Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/17/2014Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/17/2014Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 07/17/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/17/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/17/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 07/17/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/22/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 07/22/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/22/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/22/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/22/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 07/22/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/22/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/22/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 07/22/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/22/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 07/22/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/22/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 07/22/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/22/2014
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/22/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/22/2014
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19] 07/22/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 07/22/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/24/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/24/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/24/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 07/24/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/24/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 07/24/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/24/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/24/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/24/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/24/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/24/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/24/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/24/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/28/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/28/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/28/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/30/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 07/30/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/31/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/31/2014

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/17/2014 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security09/02/2014 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs07/17/2014 Referred to
House Agriculture07/17/2014 Referred to
House Natural Resources07/17/2014 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation07/18/2014 Referred to
House Homeland Security07/17/2014 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security07/18/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5137. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/17/2014)

Asylum Reform and Border Protection Act of 2014 - Amends the William Wilberforce Trafficking Victims Protection Reauthorization Act of 2008 to direct the Secretary of State to negotiate agreements between the United States and other countries for the repatriation of children. Requires that such agreements protect children from severe forms of trafficking in persons and provide for their safe removal and repatriation. (Current law provides separate procedures for unaccompanied alien children from countries that are or are not contiguous to the United States.)

Subjects all children who do not make a claim of asylum or fear of persecution to initial screening and expedited removal. (Maintains the exception for Cuban children arriving by air.)

Prohibits the government from bearing any expense of counsel for any person in a removal or related appeal proceedings.

Adds an additional requirement in order to establish a credible fear of persecution claim in an asylum interview.

Limits humanitarian and public interest parole authority.

Prohibits the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) from using parole authority for an alien who is ineligible for refugee status.

Authorizes the DHS Secretary to designate groups as criminal street gangs. Requires detention for anyone found inadmissible or deportable for criminal street gang membership. Bars individuals found inadmissible or deportable for such membership from asylum, temporary protected status, or special immigrant juvenile status.

Amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to revise the definition of "unaccompanied alien child."

Prohibits an unaccompanied alien child (UAC) from applying for asylum if such child: (1) may be removed to a safe third country, or (2) has not applied for asylum within one year after arrival in the United States.

Provides for additional immigration judges and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE) attorneys.

National Security and Federal Lands Protection Act - Prohibits the Secretary of the Interior or the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA) from restricting specified U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) activities on federal land within 100 miles of an international land border to: (1) execute search and rescue operations, and (2) prevent unlawful U.S. entries through the international land borders of the United States.

Directs the Secretary of State to suspend all foreign assistance to certain countries that refuse to: (1) negotiate a child repatriation agreement, or (2) accept from the United States repatriated unaccompanied alien children who are nationals or residents of the sending country.

Permits the use of foreign assistance for repatriation and reintegration purposes.