Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/05/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 02/05/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/08/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/08/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/08/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/15/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/15/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 02/15/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/25/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/09/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/12/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/25/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 05/03/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 05/03/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/03/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 05/03/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/10/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/10/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/11/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/18/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/22/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 12/03/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/31/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/14/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/27/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 03/06/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/03/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 04/03/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 04/03/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/08/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 06/26/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/26/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 07/31/2014