There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Senior Executive Service Accountability Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Senior Executive Service Accountability Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 5, United States Code, to enhance accountability within the Senior Executive Service, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/16/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7591)
09/16/2014Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 113-603.
07/23/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/17/2014SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/16/2014-8:37pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/16/2014-8:37pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7591)
09/16/2014-8:12pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5169.
09/16/2014-8:12pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7591-7594)
09/16/2014-8:12pmHouseMr. Meadows moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/16/2014HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 448.
09/16/2014HouseReported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 113-603.
07/24/2014HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
07/24/2014HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
07/23/2014HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
07/23/2014HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/23/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/09/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Government Reform07/23/2014 Referred to
07/24/2014 Markup by
09/16/2014 Reported by H. Rept. 113-603
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/17/2014 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5169.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5169. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/16/2014)

Senior Executive Service Accountability Act - (Sec. 2) Requires each federal agency to include in its biennial report to the Office of Personnel Management (OPM) for a specific number of Senior Executive Service (SES) positions a justification for each position (by title and organizational location) and the specific result expected from each such position, including the impact of such result on the agency mission.

(Sec. 3) Extends from one year to two years the probationary period for SES employees.

(Sec. 4) Eliminates the authority for allowing an individual removed from the SES for a less than fully successful executive performance to retain an SES pay grade level if appointed to a civil service position.

(Sec. 5) Requires a written description of employee performance requirements to be provided to SES employees not later than 30 calendar days before each rating period.

(Sec. 6) Makes SES employees subject to the same 14-day (or less) suspension period, without duties and pay, as is applicable to other federal employees. Expands the grounds for suspension or termination of an SES employee to include such cause as would promote the efficiency of the SES.

Requires: (1) a written decision of an adverse action to be rendered not later than 30 days after the employee's answer to such action is received, and (2) any SES employee who is terminated from service to repay any salary received and forfeit any annual leave accumulated during the period of any adverse action leading to termination.