There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to retire coal preference right lease applications for which the Secretary has made an affirmative commercial quantities determination, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/22/2014Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-704.
07/23/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
12/22/2014Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 535.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/22/2014Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-704.
11/19/2014Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
11/19/2014Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/19/2014Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
09/17/2014Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources
07/30/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/23/2014Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/23/2014Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 07/23/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources07/23/2014 Referred to
11/19/2014 Markup by
12/22/2014 Reported by H. Rept. 113-704
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources07/30/2014 Referred to
09/17/2014 Hearings by
11/19/2014 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.5176.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5176. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (12/22/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to retire any coal preference right lease application for which an affirmative commercial quantities determination has been made, by issuing bidding rights in exchange for relinquishment of the application, including payment to the relevant state of 50% of the dollar amount of any bidding right subsequently used in lieu of any monetary payment of a bonus in a coal lease sale or of rental or royalty under a federal coal lease.

Requires the Secretary to make such payments from revenues received under federal mineral leases.

Declares such bidding rights to be fully transferable to any other person.

Terminates a bidding right five years from its date of issue, not counting any period in which exercise of the bidding right is precluded by temporary injunctive relief granted under, or administrative, legislative, or judicial suspension of, the federal coal leasing program.