Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/05/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 02/06/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/11/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 02/11/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/11/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/11/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 02/11/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/27/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 02/27/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/27/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/06/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/06/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/06/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 03/24/2014