Refine your search

Refined by:

Arizona Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 02/25/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/19/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/23/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 07/30/2013