Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 02/06/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/12/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 02/12/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 04/17/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/17/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/26/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/07/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/30/2014