Refine your search

Refined by:

Virginia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/13/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 03/20/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 04/17/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/08/2013