There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Industrial Hemp Farming Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Controlled Substances Act to exclude industrial hemp from the definition of marihuana, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/06/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
04/15/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/08/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/06/2013Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2013Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2013Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 02/06/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 02/06/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/27/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 02/27/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 03/14/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 03/14/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 03/19/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/20/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 04/17/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/08/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/09/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/18/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/23/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/25/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 07/31/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 08/01/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/09/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 10/15/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 09/18/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/06/2013 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/08/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary02/06/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations04/15/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.525. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/06/2013)

Industrial Hemp Farming Act of 2013 - Amends the Controlled Substances Act to exclude industrial hemp from the definition of "marihuana." Defines "industrial hemp" to mean the plant Cannabis sativa L. and any part of such plant, whether growing or not, with a delta-nine tetrahydrocannabinol concentration of not more than 0.3 percent on a dry weight basis. Deems Cannabis sativa L. to meet that concentration limit if a person grows or processes it for purposes of making industrial hemp in accordance with state law.