Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 02/27/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 03/14/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 03/14/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 03/19/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 04/17/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/08/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/09/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/23/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 09/18/2014