Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/06/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 02/06/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/26/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/26/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/26/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/17/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/16/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/12/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/19/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/25/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/31/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 07/31/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/31/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/10/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/10/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 11/12/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 11/12/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 12/12/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/03/2014