Refine your search

10 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
10/02/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-40.
10/02/2013 Signed by President.
09/27/2013 Presented to President.
09/26/2013 Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendment to Senate amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6932-6933)
09/25/2013 Resolving differences -- House actions: House agreed to Senate amendment with an amendment pursuant to H. Res. 354.(consideration: CR H5824-5825)
09/19/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 97 - 2. Record Vote Number: 203.
09/19/2013 Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
04/26/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 394 - 1 (Roll no. 128).
04/18/2013 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-42.
02/06/2013 Introduced in House