Text: H.R.5272 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (09/08/2014)

Calendar No. 551

113th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 5272


To prohibit certain actions with respect to deferred action for aliens not lawfully present in the United States, and for other purposes.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

August 5 (legislative day, August 1), 2014

Received; read the first time

September 8, 2014

Read the second time and placed on the calendar


AN ACT

To prohibit certain actions with respect to deferred action for aliens not lawfully present in the United States, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Limitation on Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals; restrictions on employment authorization for aliens not in lawful status.

No agency or instrumentality of the Federal Government may use Federal funding or resources after July 30, 2014—

(1) to consider or adjudicate any new or previously denied application of any alien requesting consideration of deferred action for childhood arrivals, as authorized by Executive memorandum dated June 15, 2012 and effective on August 15, 2012 (or by any other succeeding Executive memorandum or policy authorizing a similar program);

(2) to newly authorize deferred action for any class of aliens not lawfully present in the United States; or

(3) to authorize any alien to work in the United States if such alien—

(A) was not lawfully admitted into the United States in compliance with the Immigration and Nationality Act (8 U.S.C. 1101 et seq.); and

(B) is not in lawful status in the United States on the date of the enactment of this Act.

Passed the House of Representatives August 1, 2014.

Attest:
Karen L. Haas,

Clerk  


Calendar No. 551

113th CONGRESS
     2d Session
H. R. 5272

AN ACT
To prohibit certain actions with respect to deferred action for aliens not lawfully present in the United States, and for other purposes.

September 8, 2014
Read the second time and placed on the calendar