There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Child Welfare Provider Inclusion Act of 2014

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure that organizations with religious or moral convictions are allowed to continue to provide services for children.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/30/2014 Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
07/30/2014 Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2014 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/30/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 07/30/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 07/30/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 07/30/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 07/30/2014
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/30/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 07/30/2014
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 07/30/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 07/30/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 07/30/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 07/30/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 07/30/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/30/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 07/30/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/30/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 07/30/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 07/30/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/30/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 07/30/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13]* 07/30/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/31/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/31/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/31/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 07/31/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/31/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/31/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/31/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/31/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/31/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 08/01/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 08/01/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 09/08/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 09/08/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/08/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 09/08/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/08/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/08/2014
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 09/08/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 09/08/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/08/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/08/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/08/2014
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/09/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 09/09/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/11/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 09/11/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/11/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 09/11/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 09/11/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 09/11/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/18/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/18/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 09/18/2014
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 11/13/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means07/30/2014 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (7)

  • Administrative remedies
  • Adoption and foster care
  • Child safety and welfare
  • Civil actions and liability
  • Poverty and welfare assistance
  • Religion

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5285. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/30/2014)

Child Welfare Provider Inclusion Act of 2014 - Prohibits the federal government, and any state that receives federal funding for any program that provides child welfare services under part B (Child and Family Services) or part E (Federal Payments for Foster Care and Adoption Assistance) of title IV (Grants to States for Aid and Services to Needy Families with Children and for Child-Welfare Services) of the Social Security Act (SSA), from discriminating or taking an adverse action against a child welfare service provider that declines to provide, facilitate, or refer for a child welfare service that conflicts with the provider's sincerely held religious beliefs or moral convictions.

Bars such prohibition from applying to SSA requirements that forbid state entities from denying or delaying adoption or foster care placements on the basis of an adoptive parent's or a child's race, color, or national origin.

Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to withhold 15% of the federal funds that a state receives for such programs if the state violates this Act.

Allows an aggrieved child welfare service provider to assert such an adverse action violation as a claim or defense in a judicial proceeding and to obtain all appropriate relief (including declaratory relief, injunctive relief, compensatory damages, and reasonable attorney fees and costs).