Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/14/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 02/25/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/27/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 02/27/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 02/27/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 02/27/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 02/28/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/12/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/12/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 03/12/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/15/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/21/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 05/21/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/11/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/30/2013