There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Private Student Loan Bankruptcy Fairness Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 11 of the United States Code to modify the dischargeability of debts for certain educational payments and loans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/06/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/28/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/06/2013Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 02/06/2013
Del. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/28/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/28/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 02/28/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/12/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/12/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/12/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/12/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 03/20/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/18/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/09/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/09/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/20/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/20/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/12/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/12/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/26/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/26/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/26/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/29/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/17/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/10/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/31/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 11/14/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary02/06/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law02/28/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.532.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.532. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/06/2013)

Private Student Loan Bankruptcy Fairness Act of 2013 - Amends the federal bankruptcy code to limit the non-dischargeability, except in cases of undue hardship, of educational loans to those made, insured, or guaranteed by a governmental unit, or made under any program funded by a governmental unit or any program for which substantially all of the funds are provided by a nonprofit institution (thus allowing the discharge of private educational loan indebtedness without the need to show an undue hardship).