Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/28/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/28/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 02/28/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/12/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/12/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/12/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/12/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 03/20/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/18/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/09/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/09/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/20/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/20/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/12/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/12/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/26/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/26/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/26/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/29/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/17/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/10/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/31/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 11/14/2014