Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 05/23/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/23/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/17/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 06/27/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/19/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 08/01/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/12/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/30/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/11/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/11/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 02/26/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/06/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/14/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 07/14/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/14/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/14/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/14/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 08/01/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/01/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 08/01/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/17/2014