Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/06/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/13/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 02/13/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/14/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 02/25/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/25/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/13/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/20/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/23/2013