Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 02/25/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 03/13/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/18/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/26/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/26/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/26/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/26/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 09/26/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 09/27/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/27/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/27/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/01/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/01/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/01/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/02/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/04/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 10/10/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/11/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/22/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 10/28/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/30/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 11/12/2013