Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/12/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 02/15/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/15/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/25/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/28/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/28/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 02/28/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 02/28/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/04/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/04/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 03/05/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 03/05/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/11/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/11/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/12/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/13/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/18/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/18/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 03/25/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/10/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/06/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 09/16/2013