There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal charter of the Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States to reflect the service of women in the Armed Forces of the United States.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/04/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-199. (TXT | PDF)
12/04/2014 Signed by President.
11/24/2014 Presented to President.
11/20/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6219)
11/17/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8012)
11/17/2014 Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-620.
09/10/2014 Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
12/04/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-199. (TXT | PDF)
12/04/2014 Signed by President.
11/24/2014 House Presented to President.
11/21/2014 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
11/20/2014 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6219)
11/18/2014 Senate Received in the Senate, read twice.
11/17/2014-3:32pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/17/2014-3:32pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8012)
11/17/2014-3:22pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5441.
11/17/2014-3:22pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8012-8014)
11/17/2014-3:22pm House Mr. Holding moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/17/2014 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 461.
11/17/2014 House Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-620.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/13/2014 House Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/13/2014 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/12/2014 House Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security Discharged.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/26/2014 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/10/2014 House Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
09/10/2014 House Introduced in House

Cosponsors (82)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 09/15/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/16/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/16/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 09/16/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/16/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/16/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 09/16/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/17/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/17/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 09/17/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/17/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 09/17/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/17/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/17/2014
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/17/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/17/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/17/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/17/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 09/17/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/17/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/17/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/17/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/18/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/18/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/18/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 09/18/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/18/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 09/18/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 09/18/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 09/18/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 09/18/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 09/18/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/18/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 09/18/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/18/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/18/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/19/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/19/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/19/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/19/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/19/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 09/19/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/19/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/19/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/19/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/12/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/12/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 11/12/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 11/12/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 11/12/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 11/12/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/12/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/12/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 11/12/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 11/12/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/12/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 11/12/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/12/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/12/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 11/12/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 11/12/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/12/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 11/12/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 11/12/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 11/12/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/12/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 11/12/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/12/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 11/12/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 11/12/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 11/12/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/12/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 11/12/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/13/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 11/13/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 11/14/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/14/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/14/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 11/14/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 11/14/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 11/17/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 11/17/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary09/10/2014 Referred to
11/13/2014 Markup by
11/17/2014 Reported by H. Rept. 113-620
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security09/26/2014 Referred to
11/12/2014 Discharged from

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (5)

  • Conflicts and wars
  • Government corporations and government-sponsored enterprises
  • Veterans' organizations and recognition
  • Women's rights

Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.5441. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-199 (12/04/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the federal charter of the Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States to describe the organization as a national association of veterans (currently, an association of men) who, as soldiers, sailors, marines, and airmen, served this Nation in wars, campaigns, and expeditions on foreign soil or in hostile waters.

Expands its purpose of assisting widows to that of assisting surviving spouses.