There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 49, United States Code, to provide for limitations on the fees charged to passengers of air carriers.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/19/2014Became Public Law No: 113-294. (TXT | PDF)
12/19/2014Signed by President.
12/09/2014Presented to President.
12/04/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/04/2014Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6354)
09/17/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 423 - 0 (Roll no. 505).(text: CR 09/16/2014 H7612)
09/15/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/19/2014Became Public Law No: 113-294. (TXT | PDF)
12/19/2014Signed by President.
12/09/2014HousePresented to President.
12/08/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/04/2014SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/04/2014SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6354)
09/18/2014SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
09/17/2014-1:52pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 423 - 0 (Roll no. 505). (text: CR 09/16/2014 H7612)
09/17/2014-1:52pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/17/2014-1:44pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7635-7636)
09/16/2014-9:58pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/16/2014-9:47pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5462.
09/16/2014-9:47pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7612-7613)
09/16/2014-9:47pmHouseMr. Hudson moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/15/2014HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
09/15/2014HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Homeland Security09/15/2014 Referred to
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation09/18/2014 Referred to
12/04/2014 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.5462.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.5462. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-294 (12/16/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Revises aviation passenger security fee requirements to limit per round trip fees to $11.20.