Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 02/06/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 02/12/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/12/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 02/12/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/13/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/13/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/13/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 02/13/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/25/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 03/06/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/15/2013