Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 09/11/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/25/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/04/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/29/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/12/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 11/12/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 12/10/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/07/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/27/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/28/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/05/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/27/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 03/13/2014