Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/12/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/28/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/29/2014