There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To approve the Keystone XL Pipeline.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
11/14/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 252 - 161, 1 Present (Roll no. 519).(text: CR 11/13/14 H7965)
11/12/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/17/2014SenateReceived in the Senate.
11/14/2014-12:53pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/14/2014-12:53pmHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 252 - 161, 1 Present (Roll no. 519). (text: CR 11/13/14 H7965)
11/14/2014-12:43pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 192 - 224 (Roll no. 518).
11/14/2014-12:13pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7965)
11/13/2014-6:58pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule 19, further proceedings on the motion to recommit with instructions to H.R. 5682 were postponed until a time to be announced.
11/13/2014-6:58pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H7972)
11/13/2014-6:52pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Capps motion to recommit with instructions, pending reservation of a point order. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment requiring TransCanada, the developer of the Keystone XL pipeline, to certify to the President that the oil or other products derived from Canadian oil sands that are transported through the pipeline will be treated similarly to conventional crude oil for the purposes of determining contributions that fund the Oil Spill Liability Trust Fund. Companies that transport oil are required to pay 8-cents per barrel into the trust fund that is used by the federal government to respond to oil spills. Oil sands crude is currently exempt from making such contributions. Subsequently, the reservation of a point of order was withdrawn.
11/13/2014-6:51pmHouseMrs. Capps moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Transportation. (consideration: CR H7971-7972; text: CR H7971)
11/13/2014-6:50pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H7971)
11/13/2014-5:52pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 5682.
11/13/2014-5:52pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 5682 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
11/13/2014-5:52pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 748. (consideration: CR H7965-7972)
11/13/2014-5:46pmHouseRule H. Res. 748 passed House.
11/12/2014-7:27pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 748 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5682 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
11/12/2014HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/12/2014HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/12/2014HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/12/2014HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 11/13/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/13/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 11/13/2014

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure11/12/2014 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce11/12/2014 Referred to
House Natural Resources11/12/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5682. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (11/14/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes TransCanada Keystone Pipeline, L.P. to construct, connect, operate, and maintain the pipeline and cross-border facilities specified in an application filed by TransCanada Corporation to the Department of State on May 4, 2012.

Deems the Final Supplemental Environmental Impact Statement regarding the pipeline issued by the Secretary of State in January 2014 to fully satisfy the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969, and any law that requires federal agency consultation or review, including the Endangered Species Act of 1973.

Declares any applicable federal permit or authorization issued before enactment of this Act to remain in effect.

Restricts any legal challenges regarding a federal agency action and such facilities to judicial review on direct appeal to the U.S. Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit.

Declares that this Act does not alter any federal, state, or local process or condition in effect on the date of enactment of this Act that is necessary to secure access from an owner of private property to construct the pipeline and cross-border facilities.