Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 02/25/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/26/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/26/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/28/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 03/04/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/04/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/04/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/05/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 03/06/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/12/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 03/12/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 03/13/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/13/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/13/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/13/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/13/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/15/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/20/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/21/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/16/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 04/16/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/16/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 04/16/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/23/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/07/2013