Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/12/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 02/27/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/27/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 02/27/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 02/27/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 03/20/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/09/2014