There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.5739. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-270 (12/18/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

No Social Security for Nazis Act - Amends title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) (OASDI) of the Social Security Act (SSA) to consider the following individuals to be removed under the Immigration and Nationality Act and so to have their OASDI benefits terminated:

  • an individual with respect to whom an order admitting the individual to citizenship has been revoked and set aside where such action is based on conduct relating to participation in Nazi persecution, concealment of a material fact about such conduct, or willful misrepresentation about such conduct; and
  • an individual who, pursuant to a settlement agreement with the Attorney General (AG), has admitted to such conduct and has lost status as a U.S. national by renouncing that status.

Requires such individuals to have been considered removed under such Act as of the date of the revocation, setting aside, or renunciation.

Prohibits such individuals from receiving other Social Security benefits based on the wages and self-employment income of any other individual.

Prohibits the payment to such individuals also of any benefits under SSA tile XVI (Supplemental Security Income) (SSI).

Requires the AG or the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) to notify the Commissioner of Social Security of such revocations, setting asides, and renunciations of nationality.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
12/18/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-270. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2014 Signed by President.
12/10/2014 Presented to President.
12/04/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6354-6355)
12/02/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 420 - 0 (Roll no. 537).(text: CR H8232)
11/19/2014 Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
12/18/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-270. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2014 Signed by President.
12/10/2014 House Presented to President.
12/08/2014 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
12/04/2014 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6354-6355)
12/03/2014 Senate Received in the Senate, read twice.
12/02/2014-4:04pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 420 - 0 (Roll no. 537). (text: CR H8232)
12/02/2014-4:04pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/02/2014-3:35pm House UNFINISHED BUSINESS - The Chair announced that the unfinished business was the question on adoption of motions to suspend the rules which had been debated earlier and on which further proceedings had been postponed.
12/02/2014-3:35pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8260)
12/02/2014-12:54pm House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/02/2014-12:34pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5739.
12/02/2014-12:33pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8232-8237)
12/02/2014-12:33pm House Mr. Johnson, Sam moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/19/2014 House Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
11/19/2014 House Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8077)
11/19/2014 House Introduced in House

Titles (5)

Short Titles:

Short Titles as Enacted:

No Social Security for Nazis Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House:

No Social Security for Nazis Act

Short Titles as Introduced:

No Social Security for Nazis Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate:

No Social Security for Nazis Act

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

To amend the Social Security Act to provide for the termination of social security benefits for individuals who participated in Nazi persecution, and for other purposes.


Subjects (6)

  • Citizenship and naturalization
  • Congressional oversight
  • Poverty and welfare assistance
  • Social security and elderly assistance
  • War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 11/19/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 12/01/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/01/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 12/01/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 12/01/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 12/01/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/01/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/01/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/01/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/01/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 12/01/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 12/01/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 12/02/2014
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 12/02/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means11/19/2014 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.