Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/12/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 02/12/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/13/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 02/13/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/13/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 03/14/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 03/14/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 03/14/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/14/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/19/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/09/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/09/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/10/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/12/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/12/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/16/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 04/26/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/20/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/19/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/28/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 07/23/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/10/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/25/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/09/2013