Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/12/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/12/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 02/12/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/12/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/13/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/13/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/14/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/14/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/14/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/14/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/14/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 02/28/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 03/06/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/14/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 03/18/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/19/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/24/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 06/13/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 06/26/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 06/26/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/11/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/17/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 11/14/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 01/16/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/01/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 04/01/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/09/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/10/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/28/2014
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 04/28/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 09/18/2014