Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/12/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/12/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 02/12/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/12/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/14/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 02/14/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/12/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/12/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 03/12/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/12/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 03/15/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/15/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 03/15/2013