Refine your search

12 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
03/13/2013 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
02/14/2013 Senate Received in the Senate.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
02/13/2013-1:38pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 354 - 72 (Roll no. 39). (text: CR H465)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
02/13/2013-1:38pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
02/13/2013-1:09pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H479-480)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
02/13/2013-1:07pm House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
02/13/2013-12:22pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 592.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
02/13/2013-12:22pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H465-479)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
02/13/2013-12:22pm House Mr. Barletta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
02/11/2013 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure
02/08/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
02/08/2013 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral