Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
09/26/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-166.
09/26/2014 Signed by President.
09/23/2014 Presented to President.
09/18/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5862)
07/28/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6933)
07/24/2014 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-556.
02/08/2013 Introduced in House