Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/08/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/12/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/12/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 02/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/28/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/28/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/28/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/28/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/28/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/28/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 02/28/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/28/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 02/28/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 02/28/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/28/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 02/28/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/28/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/04/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 03/18/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/22/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/03/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 07/25/2014