There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Public Lands Renewable Energy Development Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote the development of renewable energy on public lands, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/08/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
07/29/2014Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources
02/25/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
02/21/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/08/2013Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/08/2013Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/08/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (61)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 02/08/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 02/08/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 02/27/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 02/27/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 02/27/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/27/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/27/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/27/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/09/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 04/09/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/24/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 04/30/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/30/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 05/21/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/21/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/21/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/12/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/14/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/27/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/27/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/10/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 07/10/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/10/2013
Rep. Rodgers, Cathy McMorris [R-WA-5] 09/10/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/10/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 09/10/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 12/02/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/10/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 01/10/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/12/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/21/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 03/24/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/01/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 05/01/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 06/12/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/12/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/28/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/18/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/08/2013 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources02/21/2013 Referred to
07/29/2014 Hearings by
House Agriculture02/08/2013 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry02/25/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.596.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.596. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/08/2013)

Public Lands Renewable Energy Development Act of 2013 - Amends the Energy Policy Act of 2005 to require amounts received through FY2020 (currently, through FY2010) from leases under the Geothermal Steam Act of 1970 to be available to the Secretary of the Interior to spend in such amounts as are provided in advance appropriations acts for implementing such Acts.

Requires the Secretary of Interior and the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA) to each establish a wind and solar leasing pilot program under which lease sales are conducted on covered public lands administered by the Secretary concerned to carry out wind and solar energy projects. Requires the Secretaries to jointly determine as to whether to expand the pilot program to apply to all covered public lands. Defines "covered land" to mean land that is: (1) public land administered by the Secretary of the Interior, or National Forest System land administered by the Secretary of Agriculture; and (2) not excluded from development of solar or wind energy under a final land use plan established under the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976, a final land and resource management plan established under the National Forest Management Act of 1976, or federal law.

Establishes in the Treasury the Renewable Energy Resource Conservation Fund to be administered by the Secretary of the Interior for use in regions impacted by the development of wind or solar energy on public lands. Requires Fund amounts to be used in those regions for: (1) the protection and restoration of important fish and wildlife habitat; and (2) the assurance and improvement of access to federal lands and waters for hunting, fishing, and other forms of outdoor recreation.

Requires the Secretaries to determine the feasibility of carrying out a mitigation banking program on federal lands administered by the Secretaries to fully offset the impacts of wind or solar energy on such lands.