Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 02/08/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 02/08/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 02/08/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 02/27/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 02/27/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 02/27/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/27/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/27/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/27/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/09/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 04/09/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/24/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 04/30/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/30/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 05/21/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/21/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/21/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/12/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/14/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/27/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/27/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/10/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 07/10/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/10/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/10/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/10/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 09/10/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 12/02/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/10/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 01/10/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/12/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/21/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 03/24/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/01/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 05/01/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 06/12/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/12/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/28/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/18/2014